THE HOLDEN F5 STEAM LOCOMOTIVE TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Undertaking the building of a replica Class F5 2-4-2T locomotive for use on preserved railways.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 08 July 2002: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
STEPHEN PHILIP COOPER | Chair | 20 August 2001 |
|
|
||||
Graham Eric Rowland | Trustee | 14 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Aidan Brian Kelly | Trustee | 04 December 2013 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | 31/08/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £24.94k | £258.77k | £116.13k | £16.30k | £9.97k | |
|
Total expenditure | £1.23k | £1.35k | £114.55k | £1.75k | £1.40k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2024 | 20 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 19 May 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 24 March 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | 24 March 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 11 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | 11 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 11 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED ON 20TH AUGUST 2001 COMPANY NUMBER 4273383
Charitable objects
THE COMPANY'S OBJECTS ARE 1) TO BUILD, PRESERVE, OPERATE AND EXHIBIT FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT FOR EDUCATIONAL AND INSTRUCTIONAL PURPOSES LOCOMOTIVES OF HISTORIC OR SCIENTIFIC IMPORTANCE BUILT BY, ACQUIRED BY OR LEASED OR OTHERWISE MADE AVAILABLE TO THE COMPANY AND IN PARTICULAR A HOLDEN CLASS F5 STEAM LOCOMOTIVE 2) TO AFFORD THE PUBLIC ACCESS TO THE STUDY, IMPROVEMENT AND PERFECTION OF THE RADIAL WHEEL ARRANGEMENT 3) TO CARRY OUT THE PRESERVATION AND RESTORATION OF RAILWAY VEHICLES AND ARTEFACTS
Area of benefit
NATIONAL
Contact information
- Address:
-
49 BEECH AVENUE
HALSTEAD
CO9 2TT
- Phone:
- 01787474213
- Email:
- info@holdenf5.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window