OLDER PEOPLE'S NEW OPPORTUNITIES CONSORTIUM (OPNOCS)

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
OPNOCS provides: Community activities to encourage older people who are experiencing loneliness to join them and make new friends. Weekly Coffee morning, Weekly seated yoga, Craft club, Trips, Health and wellbeing events. A quarterly newsletter is sent to all members informing them of activities provided by local organisations, opnocs trips and events plus issues that affect older people
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 September 2024
Total income includes £20,000 from 1 government contract(s)
People

4 Trustee(s)
5 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityOne or more of the employees were formerly trustees
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Other Charitable Activities
- Birmingham City
Governance
- 12 February 2003: Standard registration
- OPNOCS (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investment
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Irene Jones | Trustee | 29 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Carole Ann Davis | Trustee | 29 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Rita Hiatt | Trustee | 04 March 2020 |
|
|
||||
Melanie Jayne Hughes | Trustee | 26 February 2019 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/09/2020 | 30/09/2021 | 30/09/2022 | 30/09/2023 | 30/09/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £21.09k | £18.55k | £23.35k | £22.68k | £27.63k | |
|
Total expenditure | £17.03k | £14.66k | £20.22k | £20.36k | £26.81k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | £18.96k | £20.00k | |
|
Income from government grants | £18.50k | £18.50k | £18.50k | £0 | £0 |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2024 | 10 March 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2024 | Accounts not yet received | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2023 | 13 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2022 | 21 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2021 | 21 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2020 | 03 March 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 18 NOVEMBER 2002.
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE THE RELIEF OF ELDERLY PEOPLE IN ANY MANNER WHICH NOW, OR HEREAFTER, MAY BE DEEMED BY LAW TO BE CHARITABLE.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED.
Contact information
- Address:
-
The Old Print Works
498-506 Moseley Road
Balsall Heath
B12 9AH
- Phone:
- 07951 737875
- Email:
- INFO@OPNOCS.ORG
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window