GRASSROOTS ACTION
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Grassroots Action works in low-income countries to inform, empower and enable marginalised communities to tackle poverty and promote better health / more sustainable livelihoods. We work with and through local partners to change lives and help indigenous organisations become more effective. Our current projects are based in Sierra Leone and Ghana and we also coach graduates in the UK.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 January 2020
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Other Charitable Activities
- Milton Keynes
- Ghana
- Sierra Leone
- Zimbabwe
Governance
- 04 April 2002: Standard registration
- 16 November 2022: Removed (Ceased to exist)
- POWERFUL INFORMATION (Previous name)
- Conflicting interests
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/07/2015 | 31/07/2016 | 31/07/2017 | 31/07/2018 | 31/01/2020 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £26.36k | £68.07k | £48.88k | £22.94k | £20.50k | |
|
Total expenditure | £39.38k | £52.13k | £40.05k | £45.44k | £34.89k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 January 2022 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2022 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 January 2021 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2021 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 January 2020 | 24 December 2020 | 24 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2018 | 28 May 2019 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2018 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 11TH DECEMBER 2001, AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 29TH SEPTEMBER 2004 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 15 JAN 2018
Charitable objects
(1) TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN RELATION TO THE PRODUCTION AND USE OF NATURAL RESOURCES AND THE EFFECT THAT THIS HAS ON PEOPLE AND THE NATURAL ENVIRONMENT; (2) TO SUPPORT LOCAL INITIATIVES WHICH PROMOTE SUSTAINABLE DEVELOPMENT AND STRENGTHEN CIVIL SOCIETY-AND ESPECIALLY THE EFFORTS OF NON-GOVERNMENTAL ORGANISATIONS AND KEY INSTITUTIONS INVOLVED IN ENVIRONMENTAL EDUCATION, CONSERVATION, RESEARCH AND REGULATION IN LESS-AFFLUENT PARTS OF THE WORLD.
Area of benefit
WORLDWIDE
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window