Accounts and annual returns JINNAH DAY CARE CENTRE

Charity number: 1114874
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 14 November 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 14 November 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2023 04 October 2024 247 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 04 October 2024 247 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2022 04 November 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 04 November 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2021 24 September 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 24 September 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2020 19 March 2021 47 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 19 March 2021 47 days late Download Open in new window