Financial history FORD END SCHOOL PTA

Charity number: 1091618
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2019 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023
Total gross income £7.08k £4.18k £4.03k £7.86k £6.00k
Total expenditure £6.31k £2.68k £7.22k £7.00k £5.69k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A