Accounts and annual returns COURIERS FOR CHRIST - UK

Charity Number: 1091074
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2013 26 January 2014 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2013 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2012 19 January 2013 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2012 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2011 14 February 2012 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2011 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2010 13 January 2011 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2010 13 January 2011 On Time