Onesight Essilorluxottica Foundation

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Support with grants capital projects in areas that the donors select.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England
Governance
- 24 May 2002: Standard registration
- LUXOTTICA CHARITABLE FOUNDATION (Previous name)
- ONE SIGHT FOUNDATION (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Anurag Hans | Chair | 23 February 2023 |
|
|
||||
Tracey Drzich | Trustee | 23 February 2023 |
|
|
||||
Stefano Melani | Trustee | 22 February 2019 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £104.94k | £1.05k | £3.25k | £52.73k | £47.07k | |
|
Total expenditure | £8.73k | £727.02k | £1.92k | £1.55k | £2.93k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 01 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 01 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 25 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 25 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 08 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 13 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 29 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 29 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED ON THE 29TH APRIL 2002 AND 10 DECEMBER 2009 as amended on 21 Feb 2023
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS ("THE OBJECTS") FOR WHICH THE CHARITY IS ESTABLISHED ARE FOR SUCH EXCLUSIVELY CHARITABLE PURPOSES IN ANY PART OF THE WORLD AS THE TRUSTEES MAY IN THEIR ABSOLUTE DISCRETION THINK FIT AND IN PARTICULAR FOR THE RELIEF OF PERSONS WHO ARE IN FINANCIAL NEED, AGED OR INFIRM.
Area of benefit
NATIONAL & OVERSEAS
Contact information
- Address:
-
Level 2 The Kensington Building
1 Wrights Lane
London
W8 5RY
- Phone:
- 01727795646
- Email:
- No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window