THE J D BURTON CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity number: 1092181
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Supporting medical research and relief of poverty

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 05 April 2024

Total income: £0
Total expenditure: £1,200

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • General Charitable Purposes
  • The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
  • The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
  • Overseas Aid/famine Relief
Who the charity helps:
  • Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
  • Other Defined Groups
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
  • Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
Where the charity operates:
  • Throughout England And Wales

Governance

Registration history:
  • 23 May 2002: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Trust
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
No policies declared
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

2 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
OLIVER DONNE BURTON Trustee
None on record
MRS HOLLY BURTON Trustee
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 05/04/2020 05/04/2021 05/04/2022 05/04/2023 05/04/2024
Total gross income £452 £194 £84 £0 £0
Total expenditure £69.73k £56.60k £3.21k £3.21k £1.20k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 05 April 2024 28 November 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2024 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2023 18 July 2024 164 days late
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2023 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2022 03 February 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2022 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2021 12 May 2022 96 days late
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2021 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2020 11 March 2021 34 days late
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2020 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
285 CATHERINGTON LANE
WATERLOOVILLE
PO8 0TE
Phone:
02392592120
Email:
No information available
Website:

No information available