THE WEST BUCKLAND SCHOOL FOUNDATION

Charity Number: 1096487
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

To promote the charitable purposes of West Buckland School.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 July 2024

Total income: £382,217
Total expenditure: £442,415

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

Main way of carrying out purposes is grant making
What the charity does:
  • Education/training
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Individuals
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
Where the charity operates:
  • Devon

Governance

Registration history:
  • 24 November 2008: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Charitable company
Other names:
  • WEST BUCKLAND SCHOOL FOUNDATION (Previous name)
Company number:
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
  • Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
  • Complaints handling
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Conflicting interests
  • Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Investing charity funds policy and procedures
  • Investment
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Social media policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

10 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
HUGO ORCHARD-LISLE Chair 27 March 2013
None on record
Sarah Nicholson Trustee 03 January 2024
None on record
Paul Smalley Trustee 03 January 2024
None on record
Rachael Ann Woosey Trustee 01 November 2023
None on record
Alexandra Jenkins Trustee 03 January 2023
None on record
Jeremy Edward Cooper Trustee 01 January 2021
None on record
ANGELA WEBB Trustee 26 July 2017
None on record
Brenda Daly Trustee 09 September 2016
None on record
Mr Bill Geen Trustee 01 December 2014
NORTH MOLTON CHURCH LANDS FEOFFEES
Received: On time
DR TOM BIGGE Trustee 04 July 2012
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/07/2020 31/07/2021 31/07/2022 31/07/2023 31/07/2024
Total gross income £221.12k £380.44k £331.57k £251.85k £382.22k
Total expenditure £405.88k £252.59k £84.75k £272.95k £442.42k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 July 2024 29 April 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2024 29 April 2025 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 July 2023 10 May 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2023 10 May 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 July 2022 27 April 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2022 27 April 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 July 2021 27 April 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2021 27 April 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 July 2020 07 May 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2020 07 May 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Linked charities

Linked charities
Governing document
SCHEME OF 10 NOVEMBER 2008
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CHARITY ARE TO ADVANCE EDUCATION THROUGH THE PROVISION OF BURSARIES OR OTHER FINANCIAL ASSISTANCE TO ENABLE YOUNG PEOPLE WHO COULD NOT OTHERWISE AFFORD IT, TO ATTEND WEST BUCKLAND SCHOOL.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Registration history
  • 24 November 2008 : Standard registration

Contact information

Address:
WEST BUCKLAND SCHOOL
WEST BUCKLAND
BARNSTAPLE
EX32 0SX
Phone:
01598760164