THE MILLS ARCHIVE TRUST
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We maintain a permanent record repository for historical and contemporary records on traditional mills and milling, care for our documents and images and encourage free public inspection of them and their use in research and learning. We actively encourage an interest in mills by developing education and information programmes based on local communities and on the need for life-long learning.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2013
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 05 April 2002: Standard registration
- 08 April 2014: Removed (Amalgamated)
- 08 April 2014: Funds transferred to 1155828 THE MILLS ARCHIVE TRUST
No other names
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2009 | 31/03/2010 | 31/03/2011 | 31/03/2012 | 31/03/2013 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £50.13k | £50.25k | £55.73k | £66.85k | £67.10k | |
|
Total expenditure | £63.00k | £62.04k | £55.68k | £56.07k | £65.96k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2014 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2014 | 24 November 2014 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2013 | 22 October 2013 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2013 | 25 October 2013 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2012 | 15 October 2012 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2012 | 15 October 2012 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2011 | 03 November 2011 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2011 | 03 November 2011 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 21 MARCH 2002
Charitable objects
I. TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN THE SUBJECT OF MILLS AND MILLING BY PROVIDING AND FACILITATING THE PUBLIC USE OF THE ARCHIVE COMPRISING THE EXISTING COLLECTION TOGETHER WITH SUCH OTHER MATERIAL, INFORMATION OR COLLECTIONS AS THE TRUSTEES MAY FROM TIME TO TIME DECIDE AND TO PRESERVE THE SAME AS THE COLLECTION II. TO FORM ESTABLISH AND SUPPORT AND TO AID IN THE FORMATION ESTABLISHMENT AND SUPPORT OF ANY OTHER CHARITABLE COMPANIES, INSTITUTIONS, ASSOCIATIONS, TRUSTS OR SOCIETIES FORMED FOR OBJECTS SIMILAR TO THE OBJECTS SET OUT ABOVE.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED. IN PRACTICE WORLDWIDE
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window