THE ECCHINSWELL HOME SCHOOL ASSOCIATION

Charity Number: 1092780
Removed charity

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Information on the charity's activities is not available.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 01 January 2005

Total income: £3,146
Total expenditure: £5,161

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • General Charitable Purposes
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
How the charity helps:
  • Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
Where the charity operates:
  • Hampshire

Governance

Registration history:
  • 04 July 2002: Standard registration
  • 13 July 2007: Removed (Voluntary removal)
Organisation type:
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
No information available
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
No policies declared
Land and property:
No information available

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 01/01/2005
Total gross income £3.15k
Total expenditure £5.16k
Income from government contracts N/A
Income from government grants N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 01 January 2007 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 01 January 2007 Not submitted
Annual return 01 January 2006 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 01 January 2006 Not submitted
Annual return 01 January 2005 31 August 2005 On Time
Accounts and TAR 01 January 2005 Not Required
Annual return 01 January 2004 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 01 January 2004 Not submitted