THE SHROPSHIRE GEOLOGICAL SOCIETY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Lectures by visiting speakers & members. Field trips. Research on geological sites & building stones. Publish leaflets & books on sites, areas & walks of geological interest. Maintain a website.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2024
People

9 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Shropshire
- Telford & Wrekin
Governance
- 11 July 2003: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dr Albert Benghiat | Chair | 13 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Dr PHILIP EXTANCE | Trustee | 09 November 2020 |
|
|||||
Martin Carruthers | Trustee | 09 December 2015 |
|
|
||||
PROFESSOR FRANK CHARLES HAY | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
Dr PETER TOGHILL | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MARY HELEN STEER | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
DAVID CARLTON SMITH BSC FGS | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
DAVID JOHN PANNETT | Trustee |
|
||||||
CHRISTINE ELIZABETH RAYNER | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | 31/12/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £862 | £1.33k | £1.25k | £1.34k | £1.59k | |
|
Total expenditure | £798 | £483 | £626 | £1.09k | £2.26k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2024 | 05 February 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 21 February 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 22 February 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 19 April 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 14 April 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 4 DECEMBER 2002
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC AND TO PROMOTE RESEARCH IN GEOLOGY AND ALLIED SCIENCES, MORE SPECIFICALLY IN SHROPSHIRE AND ADJACENT AREAS, IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY (A) ORGANISING LECTURES, DISCUSSIONS, FIELD EXCURSIONS, EXHIBITIONS AND DISPLAYS; (B) PROMOTING THE RECORDING AND CONSERVATION OR SITES OF GEOLOGICAL INTEREST
Area of benefit
SHROPSHIRE AND ADJACENT AREAS
Contact information
- Address:
-
10 Ridgebourne Road
SHREWSBURY
SY3 9AB
- Phone:
- 01743 247105
- Email:
- SGS.chair@hotmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window