ELEPHANT FAMILY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Elephant family is the world's leading charity for the endangered Asian elephant. Our mission is to save this iconic species from extinction in the wild. To achieve this goal our focus is channelled into five key areas; mobilising public concern, lobbying governments, conservation partnerships, education, training and research and fundraising.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

2 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Animals
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Economic/community Development/employment
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Other Charitable Activities
- Burma
- Cambodia
- India
- Indonesia
- Malaysia
- Thailand
Governance
- 18 April 2002: Standard registration
- ELEPHANTFAMILY (Previous name)
- THE TARA FOUNDATION (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Paying staff
- Risk management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
2 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Ruth Ganesh | Trustee | 09 October 2017 |
|
|
||||
Ramani Ganesh | Trustee | 09 October 2017 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £2.01m | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £1.91m | £293.56k | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £165.36k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £356.24k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £1.65m | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Investment | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Other | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Legacies | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £1.27m | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £638.45k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 08 July 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 27 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 19 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 03 November 2021 | 3 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 02 November 2020 | 2 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 19 November 2020 | 19 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 25 OCT 2001 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 26 JUN 2002 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 19 JAN 2016 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 12 JAN 2017
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS (“THE OBJECTS”) OF THE CHARITY ARE: (A) TO PROMOTE, BY SUCH MEANS AS ARE EXCLUSIVELY CHARITABLE, THE CONSERVATION OF THE ENVIRONMENT, INCLUDING ENDANGERED SPECIES, WILDLIFE WORLDWIDE AND THEIR HABITATS WHETHER NATURAL OR MAN-MADE AND IN PARTICULAR THE ASIAN ELEPHANT; (B) TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION AND RAISE AWARENESS OF THE PUBLIC, BOTH NATIONALLY AND INTERNATIONALLY, OF THE NEED TO DEVELOP LONG TERM CONSERVATION INITIATIVES THAT AIM TO PROMOTE CONSERVATION BY WAY OF ENGAGING LOCAL COMMUNITIES AND DEVELOPING WITHIN THEM A CULTURAL, SOCIAL AND ECONOMIC RESPONSIBILITY FOR THE CONSERVATION OF ITS WILDLIFE, WITH A PARTICULAR FOCUS ON THE CONSERVATION AND WELFARE OF THE ASIAN ELEPHANT; (C) TO ASSIST IN THE IMPLEMENTATION OF CONSERVATION INITIATIVES FOR ENDANGERED SPECIES THAT ENGAGE THE LOCAL COMMUNITIES AND THE PUBLIC GENERALLY AND PROMOTE CO-OPERATION AMONG SUCH COMMUNITIES AND THE PUBLIC GENERALLY TO ENSURE THE SUSTAINED DEVELOPMENT OF THEIR CULTURAL, SOCIAL AND ECONOMIC RESPONSIBILITY PARTICULARLY FOR (BUT NOT LIMITED TO) THE CONSERVATION OF THE ASIAN ELEPHANT AND OF ASIAN WILDLIFE GENERALLY.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
27 NEW DOVER ROAD
CANTERBURY
KENT
CT1 3DN
- Phone:
- 02039736426
- Email:
- finance@elephant-family.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window