THE RAPHAEL AND RUTH TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
providing loans and or donations to charities regestered in the UK
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2021
People

2 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Throughout London
Governance
- 26 March 2002: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
2 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Raphael Bude | Trustee |
|
||||
Ruth Bude | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2017 | 31/12/2018 | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £43.75k | £30.00k | £62.50k | £62.50k | £60.00k | |
|
Total expenditure | £41.58k | £30.80k | £31.10k | £65.30k | £45.89k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 187 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 187 days | |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 553 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 553 days | |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 26 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 26 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 18 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 18 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 04 November 2020 | 4 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 04 November 2020 | 4 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED EXECUTED ON THE 2ND DAY OF JANUARY 2002.
Charitable objects
THE TRUSTEES SHALL HOLD THE TRUST FUND AND THE INCOME THEREOF UPON TRUST TO PAY THEREFROM ALL THE PROPER COSTS AND EXPENSES INCURRED BY THE TRUSTEES IN ESTABLISHING AND ADMINISTERING THE CHARITY AND THE TRUST FUND AND SUBJECT THERETO SHALL PAY OR APPLY THE INCOME THEREOF TO SUCH CHARITABLE PURPOSES IN SUCH MANNER AND IN SUCH PROPORTIONS AS THEY SHALL FROM TIME TO TIME IN THEIR ABSOLUTE DISCRETION DETERMINE WITH POWER FOR THE TRUSTEES AT ANY TIME AND FROM TIME TO TIME TO PAY OR APPLY THE WHOLE OR ANY PART OR PARTS OF THE CAPITAL OF THE TRUST FUND AS IF IT WAS INCOME.
Area of benefit
NATIONAL AND OVERSEAS
Contact information
- Address:
-
220 STAMFORD HILL
LONDON
N16 6RD
- Phone:
- 02088002800
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window