ALL SORTS CLUB
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Information on the charity's activities is not available.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2006
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Amateur Sport
- Children/young People
- Provides Human Resources
- Richmond Upon Thames
Governance
- 30 April 2002: Standard registration
- 22 March 2008: Removed (Ceased to exist)
- ST. OSMUNDS AFTER SCHOOL CLUB (Working name)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2004 | 31/08/2005 | 31/08/2006 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £16.70k | £15.87k | £16.63k | |
|
Total expenditure | £20.98k | £12.91k | £15.12k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2007 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2007 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2006 | 29 June 2007 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2006 | 29 June 2007 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 August 2005 | 30 June 2006 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2005 | 30 June 2006 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 August 2004 | 28 October 2005 | 120 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2004 | 28 October 2005 | 120 days late |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED ON THE 1ST OF FEBRUARY 2002 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 19TH APRIL 2002.
Charitable objects
TH OBJECT FOR WHICH THE COMPANY IS FORMED IS TO PROVIDE THE NECESSARY FACILITIES FOR THE DAILY CARE, RECREATION AND EDUCATION OF CHILDREN DURING OUT OF SCHOOL HOURS;
Area of benefit
RICHMOND UPON THAMES
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window