Accounts and annual returns CONNECT (SOUTH TYNESIDE) LTD

Charity Number: 1090982
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2014 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2014 Not submitted
Annual return 31 March 2013 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2013 Not submitted
Annual return 30 September 2011 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2011 Not submitted
Annual return 31 March 2011 31 January 2012 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2011 12 December 2011 On Time