WORTHING CHORAL SOCIETY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Worthing Choral Society aims to provide at least three public Choral concerts a year,. It also undertakes charity concerts for both local and national organistions each year. It supports local luncheon clubs for the elderly. Occasional choral trips abroad are also a feature of the choir. On request we provide small choirs for weddings and other more personal occasions.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2024
Total income includes £2,520 from 1 government grant(s)
People

9 Trustee(s)
10 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Religious Activities
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Recreation
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Other Charitable Activities
- West Sussex
Governance
- 24 July 2002: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Tamsin Jane Cundy | Chair | 15 October 2019 |
|
|
||||||
Richard Tanner | Trustee | 28 January 2025 |
|
|
||||||
Jacqueline Hawkins | Trustee | 28 January 2025 |
|
|
||||||
Lois Fearman | Trustee | 01 February 2024 |
|
|
||||||
Victoria Jane Burcombe | Trustee | 12 January 2021 |
|
|
||||||
Elizabeth Mary Crockett | Trustee | 15 October 2019 |
|
|||||||
Dr Peter George Bernard Johnston | Trustee | 18 November 2014 |
|
|||||||
BARRY PHILIP BATES | Trustee |
|
|
|||||||
FIONA CLAIRE CRANE | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | 31/08/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £28.36k | £5.81k | £13.64k | £17.46k | £21.70k | |
|
Total expenditure | £14.09k | £8.81k | £19.82k | £15.29k | £15.75k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £2.24k | N/A | N/A | N/A | £2.52k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2024 | 22 April 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 03 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 02 May 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 21 April 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 26 April 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | 26 April 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED ON THE 4 SEPTEMBER 2001 AND AMENDED ON 9 JULY 2002 AND 29 JUNE 2004 AS AMENDED ON 11 DEC 2018
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE SOCIETY SHALL BE: TO ADVANCE, IMPROVE, DEVELOP AND MAINTAIN PUBLIC EDUCATION IN, AND APPRECIATION OF, THE ART AND SCIENCE OF MUSIC IN ALL ITS ASPECTS BY ANY MEANS THE TRUSTEES SEE FIT, INCLUDING THROUGH THE PRESENTATION OF PUBLIC CONCERTS AND RECITALS.
Area of benefit
WEST SUSSEX - WORTHING
Contact information
- Address:
-
18 Gannon Road
WORTHING
West Sussex
BN11 2DT
- Phone:
- 01903 202014
- Email:
- chair@worthingchoral.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window