Financial history THE ASSOCIATION OF CHAUNCY FRIENDS

Charity number: 1094609
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/07/2006 31/07/2007 31/07/2008 31/07/2009 31/07/2010
Total gross income £1.58k £2.29k £1.06k £5.51k £5.51k
Total expenditure £53.15k £487 £999 £138 £138
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A