Financial history NEWPORT ACADEMY ARTS TRUST LIMITED

Charity number: 1096434
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 04/04/2004 04/04/2005 04/04/2006 04/04/2007 04/04/2008
Total gross income £1 £1 £31.09k £20.23k £4.87k
Total expenditure £486 £2 £244 £46.97k £8.75k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A