THE WILDERNESS TRUST MINISTRIES

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We give a service to the community by giving free education free medical treatment basic health care and needs. We run a farm and a orphanage. The farm is used to provide education and assist the centre with its many projects this includes free meals to all needy children all day and night school are for all ages in basic skills.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

6 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Accommodation/housing
- Religious Activities
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Other Finance
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Hampshire
- Kent
- Uganda
Governance
- 07 April 2003: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev ROGER FREDERICK CARTER | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Tanya louise Pickering | Trustee | 01 December 2018 |
|
|
||||
Mark White | Trustee | 10 January 2015 |
|
|
||||
SHIRLEY CARTER | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
BRIAN HAYGREEN | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
DARREN BARNES | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £11.07k | £16.28k | £14.25k | £10.60k | £14.33k | |
|
Total expenditure | £8.03k | £15.73k | £14.35k | £11.89k | £13.62k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 15 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 22 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 06 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 07 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 08 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST MADE 24 JANUARY, 2003.
Charitable objects
TO ASSIST IN RELIEVING THE POVERTY OF CHILDREN IN KENYA AND THE HOMELESS IN LONDON.
Area of benefit
WORLDWIDE
Contact information
- Address:
-
40 Woodlands Park
Wash Lane
Allostock
KNUTSFORD
WA16 9LG
- Phone:
- 01565723702
- Email:
- rogfcarter@hotmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window