ARTS IN RURAL GLOUCESTERSHIRE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Increases access to and participation in high quality arts in Gloucestershire. In its rural touring scheme, the company takes away the risk for promoters by offering a substantial guarantee against loss for events booked through AIR in G.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

6 Trustee(s)
75 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Gloucestershire
Governance
- 09 June 2004: Standard registration
- AIR IN G (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Francesca Kay Martin | Trustee | 27 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Sam Wilson | Trustee | 23 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Paul Anthony Milton | Trustee | 14 November 2019 |
|
|
||||
Katie Southard Jarvis | Trustee | 24 May 2018 |
|
|
||||
JOHN PHILIP SIDNEY ROWLANDS | Trustee | 31 August 2016 |
|
|
||||
Celia Hargrave | Trustee | 19 April 2012 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £64.43k | £44.18k | £57.65k | £65.27k | £99.03k | |
|
Total expenditure | £64.76k | £34.77k | £52.91k | £66.86k | £91.98k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £43.02k | £43.02k | £43.02k | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 30 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 30 December 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 09 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 09 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 01 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 01 December 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 16 March 2022 | 44 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 16 March 2022 | 44 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 19 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 19 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 19 JUNE 2001.
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE, IMPROVE AND ADVANCE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN THE AREA OF GLOUCESTERSHIRE WITH PARTICULAR REFERENCE TO THE RURAL AREAS, BY THE ENCOURAGEMENT OF THE ARTS, INCLUDING THE ARTS OF THEATRE, MIME, DANCE, MUSIC AND OTHER ART FORMS, AND TO FORMULATE, PREPARE AND ESTABLISH SCHEMES THEREFOR.
Area of benefit
GLOUCESTERSHIRE
Contact information
- Address:
-
Chasewood Lodge
Walford Road
Ross-on-Wye
HR9 5PQ
- Phone:
- 07966238510
- Email:
- ed@calibreproductions.co.uk
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window