BRIDGE MENTORING PLUS SCHEME

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Bridge Mentoring Plus Scheme uses trained volunteer mentors to provide a one-to-one mentoring service for 10-25 year old disadvantaged young people throughout the Borough of Bridgend, South Wales. Providing education, recreational and emotional support in a confidential, non-judgemental way,we help young people achieve personal goals thus reducing the risk of social exclusion.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 29 February 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
40 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Bridgend
Governance
- 05 April 2002: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Ceri Littlewood | Trustee | 17 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
Thomas Law | Trustee | 07 August 2024 |
|
|
||||
Carl Heard | Trustee | 29 November 2023 |
|
|||||
Philip Andrew Clarke | Trustee | 11 May 2016 |
|
|
||||
Manuela Heidy Hiett | Trustee | 11 May 2016 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 29/02/2020 | 28/02/2021 | 28/02/2022 | 28/02/2023 | 29/02/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £150.82k | £206.35k | £161.75k | £227.97k | £264.90k | |
|
Total expenditure | £139.34k | £135.99k | £186.22k | £197.56k | £250.89k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | £18.33k | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £8.48k | £25.00k | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 29 February 2024 | 31 July 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 29 February 2024 | 31 July 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 28 February 2023 | 01 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2023 | 01 December 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 28 February 2022 | 01 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2022 | 01 November 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 28 February 2021 | 20 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2021 | 20 September 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 29 February 2020 | 13 January 2021 | 15 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 29 February 2020 | 13 January 2021 | 15 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 11 FEBRUARY 2002 AS AMENDED 24 MARCH 2002 AND 16 SEPTEMBER 2004 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 10 MAY 2016
Charitable objects
TO FURTHER OR BENEFIT THE RESIDENTS OF THE BRIDGEND COUNTY BOROUGH AND NEIGHBOURING COMMUNITIES AND IN SUCH PARTS OF THE UNITED KINGDOM OR THE WORLD AS DIRECTORS OF THE CHARITY MAY FROM TIME TO TIME THINK FIT AND TO FULFIL SUCH OTHER PURPOSES WHICH ARE EXCLUSIVELY CHARITABLE ACCORDING TO THE LAW OF ENGLAND AND WALES AND ARE CONNECTED WITH THE CHARITABLE WORK OF THE CHARITY WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF SEX, SEXUAL ORIENTATION, RACE OR OF POLITICAL, RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS BY: THE PROMOTION OF EQUALITY AND DIVERSITY FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT THE PREVENTION OR THE RELIEF OF POVERTY IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY PROVIDING AND ASSISTING IN THE PROVISION OF EDUCATION, TRAINING AND MENTORING PROJECT AND ACTIVITIES AND ALL THE NECESSARY SUPPORT DESIGNED TO SUPPORT INDIVIDUALS TO BECOME SELF SUFFICIENT THE RELIEF OF UNEMPLOYMENT FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC IN SUCH WAYS AS MAY BE THOUGHT FIT, IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY TO FIND EMPLOYMENT THE PROVISION OF SUPPORT AND ACTIVITIES FOR YOUNG PEOPLE OR INDIVIDUALS AND FAMILIES OR PUBLIC BENEFIT, WHICH DEVELOP THEIR SKILLS, CAPACITIES AND CAPABILITIES TO ENABLE THEM TO PARTICIPATE IN SOCIETY AS MATURE AND RESPONSIBLE INDIVIDUALS TO PROMOTE SOCIAL INCLUSION FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT BY PREVENTING PEOPLE FROM BECOMING SOCIALLY EXCLUDED, RELIEVING THE NEEDS OF THOSE PEOPLE WHO ARE SOCIALLY EXCLUDED AND ASSISTING THEM TO INTEGRATE INTO SOCIETY
Area of benefit
OFFENDERS AND EX-OFFENDERS AND THEIR FAMILIES, AND YOUNG PEOPLE IN BRIDGEND AND OTHER PARTS OF THE UNITED KINGDOM.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Bridge Mentoring Plus Scheme
46-48 Dunraven Place
BRIDGEND
CF31 1JB
- Phone:
- 01656647891
- Email:
- ed.sacco@thebridgemps.org.uk
- Website:
-
thebridgemps.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window