PENCADER FAMILY CENTRE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Family Centre provides a warm, friendly and safe environment, which aims to increase the resilience of children and their families to the problems faced by living in a deprived rural area through activities that are planned to meet specific needs of the child and their families.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

6 Trustee(s)
1 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Other Charitable Activities
- Carmarthenshire
Governance
- 15 May 2002: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Emma Price | Chair | 18 September 2018 |
|
|
||||
Sandra Terri Richards-Davies | Trustee | 05 August 2024 |
|
|
||||
Ruth Lewis | Trustee | 06 November 2023 |
|
|||||
mary Thomason | Trustee | 18 September 2018 |
|
|
||||
CHRISTINE HARRISON | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
FIOLED JONES | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £73.32k | £47.25k | £90.73k | £23.66k | £76.74k | |
|
Total expenditure | £56.54k | £50.37k | £67.02k | £60.59k | £51.87k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £2.00k | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 28 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 28 November 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 30 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 07 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 07 December 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 13 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 13 December 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 20 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 20 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 06/02/2002 AS AMENDED ON 08/05/2006
Charitable objects
I. THE PRESERVATION AND PROTECTION OF HEALTH AND THE RELIEF OF DISTRESS WITHIN FAMILY RELATIONSHIPS BY THE PROVISION OF A RESOURCE AND ADVICE CENTRE AND BY THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN GOOD PARENTING SKILLS; II. THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR RECREATION AND OTHER LEISURE TIME ACTIVITIES FOR FAMILIES WITH YOUNG CHILDREN IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE WITH A VIEW TO IMPROVING CONDITIONS OF LIFE.
Area of benefit
IN PENCADER AND SURROUNDING DISTRICT.
Contact information
- Address:
-
YR HEN GAPEL
PENCADER
DYFED
SA39 9BP
- Phone:
- 01559384490
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window