THE WALTER AND LIESEL SCHWAB CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity Number: 1091870
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

The Walter & Liesel Schwab Charitable Trust was established to assist young refugees and asylum seekers in accessing education. The Trust gives small grants to help young refugees and asylum seekers with their studies. Grants range from helping with transport costs, computers and books to helping with fees as necessary. The grants are dependent on the young person's immigration status.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 01 May 2023

Total income: £385,774
Total expenditure: £346,881

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

Main way of carrying out purposes is grant making
What the charity does:
  • Education/training
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Individuals
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
Where the charity operates:
  • Throughout England And Wales

Governance

Registration history:
  • 18 October 2006: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Complaints handling
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Conflicting interests
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Investing charity funds policy and procedures
  • Investment
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

8 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
BARONESS NEUBERGER DBE Chair 06 December 2001
THE LYONS LEARNING PROJECT
Received: On time
THE RAYNE FOUNDATION
Received: On time
LEO BAECK INSTITUTE LIMITED
Received: On time
BARONESS SALLY HAMWEE Trustee 24 May 2022
THE JANE GOODMAN CHARITABLE TRUST
Received: On time
Baroness Sally Hamwee Trustee 24 May 2022
None on record
Dr Rebecca Emily Murray Trustee 01 April 2020
None on record
Lady Diana Alethea Brittan Trustee 17 April 2018
None on record
DR KATHLEEN MARGARET PETTY-SAPHON Trustee 11 February 2016
UK CAT CONSORTIUM
Received: On time
WENDENWORLDWIDE.AID
Received: On time
SHEILA RUTH SPALDING Trustee
None on record
PROFESSOR ANTHONY JOHN NEUBERGER Trustee
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 01/05/2019 01/05/2020 01/05/2021 01/05/2022 01/05/2023
Total gross income £138.25k £106.32k £96.10k £100.24k £385.77k
Total expenditure £275.48k £262.13k £335.28k £311.66k £346.88k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 01 May 2023 01 March 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 01 May 2023 01 March 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 01 May 2022 01 March 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 01 May 2022 01 March 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 01 May 2021 25 February 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 01 May 2021 25 February 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 01 May 2020 24 February 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 01 May 2020 24 February 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 01 May 2019 26 February 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 01 May 2019 26 February 2020 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Linked charities

Linked charities
Governing document
DECLARATION OF TRUST EXECUTED ON THE 6TH DECEMBER 2001
Charitable objects
THE TRUSTEES SHALL HOLD THE TRUST FUND AND ITS INCOME UPON TRUST TO APPLY THEM FOR THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION, IN PARTICULAR HIGHER OR FURTHER EDUCATION, OF ASYLUM SEEKERS OR REFUGEES, OR FOR SUCH OTHER CHARITABLE PURPOSES AS THE TRUSTEES IN THEIR ABSOLUTE DISCRETION FROM TIME TO TIME THINK FIT. PROVIDED THAT THE TRUSTEES MAY AT THEIR ABSOLUTE DISCRETION FOR THE PERIOD OF TWENTY ONE YEARS FROM THE DATE OF THE DEED INSTEAD OF APPLYING THE INCOME OF THE CHARITY IN ANY YEAR ACCUMULATE ALL OR ANY PART OF SUCH INCOME AT COMPOUND INTEREST BY INVESTING THE SAME AND THE RESULTING INCOME IN ANY OF THE AUTHORISED INVESTMENTS AND HOLD THE SAME AS AN ACCRETION TO AND AS PART OF THE CAPITAL OF THE CHARITY WITHOUT PREJUDICE TO THEIR RIGHT TO APPLY THE WHOLE OR ANY PART OF SUCH ACCUMULATED INCOME IN ANY SUBSEQUENT YEAR AS IF THE SAME WERE INCOME OF THE CHARITY ARISING IN THE THEN CURRENT YEAR.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED IN PRACTICE NATIONAL
Registration history
  • 18 October 2006 : Standard registration

Contact information

Address:
S W Trust
PO Box 12327
CO6 4XE
Phone:
07711386974