Accounts and annual returns NISSI LIFE CHURCH

Charity number: 1093287
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 31 October 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 31 October 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2022 20 February 2024 112 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 20 February 2024 112 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2021 15 January 2023 76 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 15 January 2023 76 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2020 31 October 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 31 October 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 July 2019 04 July 2020 34 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2019 04 July 2020 34 days late Download Open in new window