Accounts and annual returns WEST SUFFOLK CROSSROADS CARING FOR CARERS

Charity number: 1091389
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2015 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2015 Not submitted
Annual return 31 March 2014 02 December 2014 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2014 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2013 10 April 2014 69 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2013 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2012 02 January 2013 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2012 02 January 2013 On Time