KNITTING AND CROCHET GUILD

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To advance public knowledge & appreciation of the crafts of knitting & crochet, to further skills in knitting & crochet and to preserve our collection of domestically produced knitted and crocheted items together with tools, publications and other artefacts.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

10 Trustee(s)
61 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Recreation
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Other Charitable Activities
- Throughout England And Wales
- Northern Ireland
- Scotland
Governance
- 29 March 2006: Standard registration
- THE KNITTING AND CROCHET GUILD (Previous name)
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Gillian Laurence | Trustee | 16 February 2025 |
|
|
||||
Maureen Wheeler | Trustee | 07 September 2024 |
|
|||||
Patricia Helen Basham | Trustee | 07 September 2024 |
|
|||||
Sarah Ann Whitelaw | Trustee | 07 September 2024 |
|
|||||
Deborah Hopkins | Trustee | 12 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Angharad Thomas | Trustee | 17 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Amalia Vittoria Liguori | Trustee | 11 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Desiree Isla Jeans | Trustee | 12 September 2020 |
|
|||||
Stephen John Foreman | Trustee | 16 July 2020 |
|
|
||||
Alison Jane Peck | Trustee | 13 July 2019 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £79.23k | £56.60k | £37.19k | £54.67k | £62.81k | |
|
Total expenditure | £69.66k | £34.08k | £35.80k | £53.51k | £47.51k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 20 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 20 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 04 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 04 December 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 28 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 28 November 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 20 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 20 December 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 20 February 2021 | 20 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 20 February 2021 | 20 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED ON 19 MAY 2005 as amended on 17 Sep 2022 as amended on 17 Sep 2022
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE PUBLIC KNOWLEDGE AND APPRECIATION OF THE CRAFTS OF KNITTING AND CROCHET PARTICULARLY BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY THROUGH THE FURTHERANCE OF SKILL AND CREATIVITY IN THE SAID CRAFTS AND THE PRESERVATION OF THE HERITAGE OF KNITTING AND CROCHET
Area of benefit
NATIONAL
Contact information
- Address:
-
Part 1st Floor
Britannia Mill
Britannia Road
Slaithwaite
Huddersfield
West Yor
- Phone:
- 01484840812
- Email:
- secretary@kcguild.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window