Financial history HEAVEN ON EARTH FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1096488
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £640 £600 £2.89k £2.11k £12.02k
Total expenditure £320 £650 £2.25k £1.95k £12.05k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A