THE L&YR SOCIETY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The L&YR Society is an educational charity devoted to the dissemination of information about The Lancashire and Yorkshire Railway throughout its 75 years of existance and beyond.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 June 2024
People

11 Trustee(s)
20 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The General Public/mankind
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Throughout England And Wales
- Australia
- Scotland
Governance
- 10 July 2003: Standard registration
- LYRS (Working name)
- THE LANCASHIRE AND YORKSHIRE RAILWWAY SOC (Working name)
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
GRAHAM SMITH | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Barry Steventon | Trustee | 14 October 2017 |
|
|
||||
Robin Christopher Pennie | Trustee | 18 October 2014 |
|
|
||||
MICHAEL FITTON | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MARTIN NIELD | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
DAVID CARTER | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
NOEL COATES | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
ROGER MELLOR | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
KENNETH CARTER | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
RONALD TINKER | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
CHRISTOPHER LEACH | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/06/2020 | 30/06/2021 | 30/06/2022 | 30/06/2023 | 30/06/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £53.21k | £48.48k | £53.02k | £52.57k | £59.81k | |
|
Total expenditure | £44.03k | £37.24k | £66.61k | £63.34k | £51.25k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2024 | 24 February 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2024 | 24 February 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2023 | 05 July 2024 | 66 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2023 | 05 July 2024 | 66 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2022 | 15 April 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2022 | 15 April 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2021 | 28 March 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2021 | 28 March 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2020 | 13 April 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2020 | 13 April 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 20 OCTOBER 2001 AS AMENDED ON 12 OCTOBER 2002.
Charitable objects
1. THE STUDY, RECORDING AND PRESERVATION, FOR THE ADVANCEMENT OF PUBLIC EDUCATION, OF INFORMATION AND ILLUSTRATIVE AND OTHER MATERIAL RELATING TO THE LANCASHIRE & YORKSHIRE RAILWAY COMPANY AND ITS PREDECESSORS AND SUCCESSORS; AND 2. TO ARRANGE THAT SUCH MATERIAL IS AVAILABLE FOR REFERENCE AND RESEARCH AND TO ENCOURAGE ITS PUBLICATION FOR THE USE AND EDUCATION BOTH OF MEMBERS OF THE SOCIETY AND OF THE PUBLIC IN GENERAL.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
31 ENFIELD CLOSE
HILTON
DERBY
DE65 5HT
- Phone:
- 01283730544
- Email:
- secretary@lyrs.org.uk
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window