Governing document UNIVERSITY OF THE THIRD AGE, NORTH NORFOLK
Charity Number: 1091827

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Governing document
Details of the type of governing document the charity has and when it was established.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 10 APRIL 1991, AS AMENDED 14 MAY 2003, 8 OCTOBER 2003 AND 8 MAY 2009. AS AMENDED BY SCHEME DATED 12 JUL 2018 as amended on 18 Nov 2020 as amended on 16 Jun 2021
Charitable objects
THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION AND, IN PARTICULAR, THE EDUCATION OF OLDER PEOPLE AND THOSE WHO ARE RETIRED FROM FULL TIME WORK, BY ALL MEANS INCLUDING ASSOCIATED ACTIVITIES CONDUCIVE TO LEARNING AND PERSONAL DEVELOPMENT.
Area of benefit
The area the charity can operate in, as set out in its governing document.
NORTH NORFOLK AND ITS SURROUNDING LOCALITY
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.