Accounts and annual returns EAST CLAYDON SCHOOL FUND

Charity number: 1091242
Charity reporting is up to date (46 days late)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 28 January 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 18 March 2025 46 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2023 14 May 2024 104 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2022 03 February 2023 3 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2021 07 November 2022 280 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2020 25 March 2021 53 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 25 March 2021 53 days late Download Open in new window