Financial history PILLARS OF TRUTH MINISTRY TRUST

Charity number: 1092394
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2020 30/06/2021 30/06/2022 30/06/2023 30/06/2024
Total gross income £46.64k £38.37k £57.32k £53.25k £63.96k
Total expenditure £32.37k £36.74k £49.11k £62.81k £74.12k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A £5.00k N/A N/A