Financial history AJODA COMMUNITY ALLIANCE

Charity number: 1093094
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £13.71k £9.03k £10.26k £15.07k £9.99k
Total expenditure £13.01k £6.50k £9.98k £8.40k £9.99k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A