FRIENDS OF NETTLEBED SCHOOL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Friends of Nettlebed School (FONS) works with the teachers to enhance each child's experience of school. Whether it be through assistance in the classroom, school outings or financially - purchasing extra equipment/facilities and by financing visits to the school by professional musicians and authors etc.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 September 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
60 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Human Resources
- Oxfordshire
Governance
- 18 March 2002: Standard registration
- FONS (Working name)
- NETTLEBED COMMUNITY FUND (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Lauren Rosher | Trustee | 14 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Harriet Estelle Sutton | Trustee | 18 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Vanessa Rosemary Hoare | Trustee | 18 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Laura Oxley | Trustee | 18 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Dr Anna Lynne Fryer | Trustee | 01 February 2023 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/09/2020 | 30/09/2021 | 30/09/2022 | 30/09/2023 | 30/09/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £5.44k | £19.64k | £27.71k | £22.91k | £30.00k | |
|
Total expenditure | £5.17k | £7.54k | £9.24k | £40.81k | £22.55k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2024 | 22 May 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2024 | 22 May 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2023 | 14 April 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2022 | 05 December 2023 | 128 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2022 | 05 December 2023 | 128 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2021 | 02 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2020 | 02 November 2021 | 95 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 17 JANUARY 2002 as amended on 11 Nov 2021
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUPILS IN THE SCHOOL IN PARTICULAR BY 1. DEVELOPING EFFECTIVE RELATIONSHIPS BETWEEN STAFF PARENTS AND OTHERS ASSOCIATED WITH THE SCHOOL; 2. ENGAGING IN ACTIVITIES OR PROVIDING FACILITIES OR EQUIPMENT WHICH SUPPORT THE SCHOOL AND ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUPILS;
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED IN PRACTICE. NETTLEBED COMMUNITY SCHOOL
Contact information
- Address:
-
Nettlebed Community School
High Street
Nettlebed
HENLEY-ON-THAMES
Oxfordshire
RG9 5DA
- Phone:
- 01491641328
- Email:
- fonscommittee@gmail.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window