THE STAFFORDSHIRE RUGBY UNION YOUTH TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The promtion of healthy sporting activities and education by giving grants to bodies of all kinds that are providing such facilities.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 September 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Amateur Sport
- Children/young People
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Staffordshire
Governance
- 10 July 2002: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
JAMES ALLINSON HECKLE | Trustee |
|
||||||
MIKE REDFERN | Trustee |
|
||||||
MICHAEL PROCTER | Trustee |
|
||||||
WILLIAM LEASON | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
JOHN FRANCIS | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/09/2020 | 30/09/2021 | 30/09/2022 | 30/09/2023 | 30/09/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £2.16k | £1 | £3 | £2.57k | £117 | |
|
Total expenditure | £3.37k | £250 | £0 | £500 | £500 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2024 | 24 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2023 | 15 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2022 | 25 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2021 | 20 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2020 | 30 November 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 6 JULY 1998 AS AMENDED BY SUPPLEMENTAL DEED DATED 12 APRIL 2002
Charitable objects
A THE ORGANISATION OR PROVISION OR ASSISTANCE IN THE ORGANISATION OR PROVISION OF THE FACILITIES WHICH WILL ENABLE OR ENCOURAGE PUPILS AT SCHOOLS AND UNIVERSITIES AND OTHER PLACES OF HIGHER EDUCATION IN ANY PART OF THE UNTIED KINGDOM TO PLAY RUGBY UNION FOOTBALL OR ANY OTHER GAMES OR SPORT SO AS TO ASSIST IN ENSURING THAT DUE ATTENTION IS GIVEN TO THE PHYSICAL EDUCATION AND DEVELOPMENT OF SUCH PUPILS AND STUDENTS AS WELL AS TO THE DEVELOPMENT AND OCCUPATION OF THEIR MINDS B) THE ORGANISATION OR PROVISION OF ASSISTANCE IN THE ORGANISATION OR PROVISION IN ANY PART OF THE UNITED KINGDOM OF FACILITIES FOR PHYSICAL RECREATION IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE (WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS FOR LIFE FOR THE PERSONS FOR WHOM THE SAME ARE PROVIDED) FOR PERSONS WHO ARE UNDER THE AGE OF TWENTY ONE YEARS AND WHO BY REASON OF THEIR YOUTH OR SOCIAL ECONOMIC CIRCUMSTANCES HAVE NEED OF SUCH FACILITIES.
Area of benefit
UNITED KINGDOM
Contact information
- Address:
-
39 SNEYD AVENUE
NEWCASTLE
ST5 2PZ
- Phone:
- 01782613772
- Email:
- mandndavies@gmail.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window