CHOSEN PEOPLE MINISTRIES (UK)

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The charity advances the Good News of Messiah Yeshua amongst Jewish people in the United Kingdom and around the world by such means as are charitable by law.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 June 2024
People

7 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Throughout England And Wales
- Northern Ireland
- Scotland
Governance
- 28 January 2003: Standard registration
- CHOSEN PEOPLE MINISTRIES CPM (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Mitchell Forman | Trustee | 18 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Kyuwon Park | Trustee | 20 March 2023 |
|
|||||
Salome Kaluba Makukula | Trustee | 20 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
Jeffrey Scott Cuozzo | Trustee | 31 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Dr MITCH GLASER | Trustee | 05 October 2018 |
|
|
||||
MICHAEL TETZLAFF | Trustee | 07 October 2016 |
|
|
||||
Rev KEITH WILLIAM EDWARD PAGE | Trustee | 07 October 2016 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/06/2020 | 30/06/2021 | 30/06/2022 | 30/06/2023 | 30/06/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £288.36k | £281.14k | £349.63k | £506.74k | £483.41k | |
|
Total expenditure | £285.52k | £282.24k | £288.01k | £434.54k | £325.23k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | N/A | N/A | N/A | £499.66k | N/A | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | N/A | N/A | N/A | £6.02k | N/A | |
|
Income - Endowments | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income - Investment | N/A | N/A | N/A | £1.06k | N/A | |
|
Income - Other | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income - Legacies | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | N/A | N/A | N/A | £407.08k | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | N/A | N/A | N/A | £27.46k | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | N/A | N/A | N/A | £145 | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Other | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2024 | 16 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2024 | 16 December 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2023 | 13 November 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2023 | 13 November 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2022 | 27 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2022 | 27 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2021 | 27 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2021 | 27 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2020 | 24 November 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2020 | 24 November 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 6TH DECEMBER 2002 AS AMENDED ON 13 JUNE 2005.
Charitable objects
THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE GOSPEL OF THE LORD JESUS CHRIST AMONG JEWS IN ALL PARTS OF THE WORLD BY SUCH MEANS AS ARE CHARITABLE BY LAW.
Area of benefit
WORLDWIDE
Contact information
- Address:
-
PO Box 47871
LONDON
NW11 1AL
- Phone:
- 02084557911
- Email:
- nataliec@chosenpeople.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window