THE FRIENDS OF MOUNT PLEASANT C E JUNIOR SCHOOL

Charity number: 1091341
Charity reporting is overdue by 311 days

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Educational Social and fund raising in aid of Mount Pleasant CE Junior School Market Weighton East Yorkshire.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 August 2022

Total income: £1,618
Total expenditure: £1,506

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
How the charity helps:
  • Other Charitable Activities
Where the charity operates:
  • East Riding Of Yorkshire

Governance

Registration history:
  • 25 March 2002: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Complaints handling
  • Conflicting interests
  • Investment
  • Paying staff
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

3 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Adele Woods Chair 24 October 2018
None on record
Daniel Nixon Trustee 24 October 2018
None on record
Ellen Roe Trustee 24 October 2018
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2018 31/08/2019 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022
Total gross income £3.76k £4.46k £4.11k £3.21k £1.62k
Total expenditure £417 £3.82k £6.37k £2.81k £1.51k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 311 days
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 311 days
Annual return 31 August 2022 29 June 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2021 29 June 2023 364 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2020 20 May 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2019 20 May 2021 324 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
MOUNT PLEASANT C OF E JUNIOR SCHOOL
PRINCESS ROAD
MARKET WEIGHTON
YORK
YO43 3BY
Phone:
01430873338