EAMONT BRIDGE VILLAGE HALL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Provide village hall facilities for local activities and clubs
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 29 February 2024
People

7 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Cumbria
Governance
- 22 August 2002: Standard registration
No other names
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Barry Cowin | Chair | 18 November 2020 |
|
|
||||
Amanda Cowin | Trustee | 18 November 2020 |
|
|
||||
Linda Mary Stanton | Trustee | 18 November 2020 |
|
|
||||
DAVID M GORDON SCOTT | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
Chris Battersby | Trustee |
|
||||||
AUDREY ELIZABETH BATTERSBY | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
SUSAN ANNE STAUDE | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 29/02/2020 | 28/02/2021 | 28/02/2022 | 28/02/2023 | 29/02/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £6.43k | £31.72k | £12.10k | £2.55k | £2.61k | |
|
Total expenditure | £4.81k | £22.83k | £3.93k | £4.69k | £6.69k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £18.39k | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 29 February 2024 | 02 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 29 February 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 28 February 2023 | 24 November 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 28 February 2022 | 18 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 28 February 2021 | 14 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2021 | 14 November 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 29 February 2020 | 30 April 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 29 February 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME OF 1 JANUARY 1954 as amended on 27 Apr 2022
Charitable objects
THE PROVISION AND MAINTENANCE OF A VILLAGE HALL AND, IF THE COMMITTEE THINK FIT, A PLAYING FIELD, FOR THE PURPOSES OF PHYSICAL AND MENTAL TRAINING AND RECREATION AND SOCIAL, MORAL AND INTELLECTUAL DEVELOPMENT THROUGH THE MEDIUM OF READING AND RECREATION ROOMS,CLUBROOMS, LIBRARY, LECTURES, CLASSES OR RECREATIONS, AS MAY BE FOUND EXPEDIENT, FOR THE ADVANTAGE OR BENEFIT OF THE HABITANTS OFF EAMONT BRIDGE AND ITS IMMEDIATE VICINITY, WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF SEX OR OF POLITICAL,RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS.
Area of benefit
EAMONT BRIDGE AND ITS IMMEDIATE VICINITY
Contact information
- Address:
-
AYSGARTH
EAMONT BRIDGE
PENRITH
CA10 2BH
- Phone:
- 01768866670
- Email:
- chrisb8491@outlook.com
- Website:
-
eamontbridgevillagehall.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window