TEIGN U3A

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Learning through various study groups covering educational, cultural, recreational and social activities
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

9 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Elderly/old People
- Provides Services
- Devon
Governance
- 28 March 2002: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Linda Elizabeth Howard | Trustee | 09 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Anita Kim Davies | Trustee | 01 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Diana Elizabeth Baker | Trustee | 01 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Kevin Nicholas Steer | Trustee | 01 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Lynda Steer | Trustee | 01 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Roger Stuart Bunce | Trustee | 20 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Johanna Florence Cornelia Bunce | Trustee | 20 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Michael Joseph Emmerson | Trustee | 24 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Roy Victor Stephenson | Trustee | 28 June 2018 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £9.95k | £3.91k | £5.61k | £11.22k | £16.89k | |
|
Total expenditure | £9.30k | £3.74k | £7.77k | £11.84k | £16.09k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | £2.69k | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 16 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 29 February 2024 | 29 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 02 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 16 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 22 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 17/10/2001 AS AMENDED ON 23/11/2005 AS AMENDED ON 26/06/2014 AS AMENDED BY SCHEME DATED 12 JUL 2018
Charitable objects
THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION AND, IN PARTICULAR, THE EDUCATION OF OLDER PEOPLE AND THOSE WHO ARE RETIRED FROM FULL TIME WORK, BY ALL MEANS INCLUDING ASSOCIATED ACTIVITIES CONDUCIVE TO LEARNING AND PERSONAL DEVELOPMENT.
Area of benefit
TEIGNBRIDGE AND ITS SURROUNDING LOCALITY
Contact information
- Address:
-
14 Elmfield Way
Kingsteignton
NEWTON ABBOT
Devon
TQ12 3GY
- Phone:
- 01626362816
- Email:
- teignu3a@gmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window