THE FRIENDS OF SOUTHWAY SCHOOL

Charity number: 1091794
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Fund raising in school.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 13 August 2023

Total income: £4,157
Total expenditure: £3,425

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
Where the charity operates:
  • West Sussex

Governance

Registration history:
  • 29 April 2002: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
  • THE FRIENDS OF MICHAEL AYRES SCHOOL (Previous name)
Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
No policies declared
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

5 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Jacqueline Wightwick-Hotson Trustee 11 October 2023
None on record
Natalie Benham Trustee 11 October 2023
None on record
KAREN ELIZABETH TAYLOR Trustee 05 November 2019
None on record
Kirstie Louise Smith Trustee 05 November 2019
None on record
Donna Charlemagne Moles Trustee 05 November 2019
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 13/08/2019 13/08/2020 13/08/2021 13/08/2022 13/08/2023
Total gross income £4.22k £2.34k £1.94k £4.70k £4.16k
Total expenditure £7.60k £3.96k £4.07k £2.99k £3.43k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 13 August 2023 13 June 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 13 August 2023 Not Required
Annual return 13 August 2022 05 June 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 13 August 2022 Not Required
Annual return 13 August 2021 06 June 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 13 August 2021 Not Required
Annual return 13 August 2020 09 June 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 13 August 2020 Not Required
Annual return 13 August 2019 08 January 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 13 August 2019 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
Southway Primary School
South Way
BOGNOR REGIS
PO21 5EZ
Phone:
01243810200
Website:

No information available