Financial history MIDLAND ACTORS THEATRE

Charity number: 1091498
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £194.75k £77.26k £50.48k £50.53k £51.23k
Total expenditure £116.65k £46.05k £105.73k £122.63k £75.17k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £180.82k £76.57k £15.71k £22.14k N/A