Financial history THE THISTLE TRUST

Charity number: 1091327
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 05/04/2020 05/04/2021 05/04/2022 05/04/2023 05/04/2024
Total gross income £19.33k £16.66k £16.77k £16.82k £28.41k
Total expenditure £69.82k £32.74k £109.39k £119.93k £383.13k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A