WELLGATE COMMUNITY FARM

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
PROMOTES THE BENEFIT OF COMMUNITY THROUGHOUT EAST LONDON AND ESSEX THROUGH EDUCATION AND TRAINING AND PROVIDING FACILITIES FOR RECREATION SOCIAL AND THERAPUTIC ACTIVITIES WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THOSE WHO HAVE NEED OF SUCH FACILITIES BY REASON OF THEIR AGE INFIRMITY DISABLEMENT POVERTY SOCIAL AND ECONOMIC CIRCUMSTANCES.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

8 Trustee(s)
250 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Animals
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Essex
- Throughout London
Governance
- 24 April 2002: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev ROGER KENNETH GAYLER | Chair |
|
||||||||
Julia Moran | Trustee | 14 December 2024 |
|
|||||||
Christine Elizabeth Mackenzie | Trustee | 14 December 2024 |
|
|
||||||
Kirsty Marie Hanmore | Trustee | 01 September 2023 |
|
|
||||||
Rebecca Snell | Trustee | 10 April 2017 |
|
|
||||||
Clare Ellen Rowley | Trustee | 04 October 2014 |
|
|
||||||
VICTORIA GEARY | Trustee |
|
|
|||||||
STEPHEN WEBB | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £193.15k | £177.75k | £205.84k | £191.58k | £211.07k | |
|
Total expenditure | £147.04k | £121.02k | £189.21k | £200.32k | £218.87k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £25.00k | £69.64k | £65.19k | £25.00k | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 22 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 22 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 29 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 29 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 05 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 05 December 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 01 February 2022 | 1 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 01 February 2022 | 1 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 18 March 2021 | 46 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 18 March 2021 | 46 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 8TH FEBRUARY 2002
Charitable objects
(A) PROMOTE THE BENEFIT OF THE COMMUNITY WITHIN EAST LONDON AND ESSEX, WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF SEX, OR OF POLITICAL, RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS BY ASSOCIATING STATUTORY AUTHORITIES, VOLUNTARY ORGANISATIONS AND THE GENERAL PUBLIC IN A COMMON EFFORT TO ADVANCE EDUCATION AND TO PROVIDE FACILITIES IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR RECREATION AND OTHER LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THOSE WHO HAVE NEED OF SUCH FACILITIES BY REASON OF THEIR YOUTH, INFIRMITY, OR DISABLEMENT, POVERTY OR SOCIAL AND ECONOMIC CIRCUMSTANCES. (B) ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC AT LARGE, IN AGRICULTURE, HORTICULTURE, HOMECRAFTS, COUNTRY LIFE, PROTECTION AND IMPROVEMENT OF THE NATURAL ENVIRONMENT THROUGH BEST ENVIRONMENTAL PRACTICES ESPECIALLY BY ENCOURAGING REDUCTION, RE-USE AND RECYCLING, AND RELATED SUBJECTS AND IN THE PRINCIPLES OF SELF-DISCIPLINE AND GOOD CITIZENSHIP AND THROUGH THEIR LEISURE TIME ACTIVITIES SO THAT THEY DEVELOP THEIR PHYSICAL, MENTAL AND SPIRITUAL CAPACITIES AND GROW TO FULL MATURITY AS INDIVIDUALS AND MEMBERS OF SOCIETY AND THEIR CONDITIONS OF LIFE MAY BE IMPROVED. (C) PROMOTE AMONG THE PUBLIC HUMANITY AND MORALITY BY ADVANCING EDUCATION IN THE CARE AND CONSIDERATION FOR ALL ANIMALS, PARTICULARLY ANIMALS IN NEED OF CARE AND PROTECTION SO THAT THE PUBLIC AND PARTICULARLY THE YOUNGER MEMBERS THEREOF WILL LEARN GREATER AWARENESS OF AND APPRECIATION FOR SUCH ANIMALS. (D) PROVIDE EDUCATION AND TRAINING FOR PERSONS WHO HAVE NEED OF SUCH FACILITIES BY REASON OF THEIR AGE, YOUTH, INFIRMITY OR DISABLEMENT, POVERTY OR SOCIAL AND ECONOMIC CIRCUMSTANCES, SO AS TO PREPARE THEM FOR ANY TRADE, OCCUPATION OR SERVICE AND THEREBY ADVANCE THEM IN LIFE TO ENABLE THEM TO EARN THEIR OWN LIVELIHOOD. (E) RELIEVE PHYSICALLY OR MENTALLY HANDICAPPED OR DISABLED OR DEPRIVED PERSONS BY THE PROVISION, AS REMEDIAL RECREATIONAL OR THERAPEUTIC ACTIVITY, OF FACILITIES, INCLUDING HORSE AND PONY RIDING AND GARDENING, SUBJECT, WHERE APPROPRIATE, TO THE CONSENT OF THE MEDICAL ADVISORS OF ALL SUCH PERSONS.
Area of benefit
WITHIN EAST LONDON AND ESSEX
Contact information
- Address:
-
WELLGATE COMMUNITY FARM
COLLIER ROW ROAD
ROMFORD
RM5 2BH
- Phone:
- 01708 747850
- Email:
- info@wellgatefarm.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window