SUSSEX LANTERN

Charity number: 1091463
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

To provide social activities, Health and fitness and rehabilitation through information and recreation activities. Support, and advice to blind and partially sighted people, and physically disabled people. Holidays for Disabled people

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024

Total income: £262,750
Total expenditure: £287,589

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • General Charitable Purposes
  • Education/training
  • The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
  • Disability
  • Arts/culture/heritage/science
  • Recreation
  • Other Charitable Purposes
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • Elderly/old People
  • People With Disabilities
  • Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Human Resources
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
  • Provides Services
  • Provides Advocacy/advice/information
  • Other Charitable Activities
Where the charity operates:
  • Brighton And Hove
  • East Sussex
  • West Sussex

Governance

Registration history:
  • 27 March 2002: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Charitable company
Other names:

No other names

Company number:
Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
  • Complaints handling
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Conflicting interests
  • Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Investing charity funds policy and procedures
  • Paying staff
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Social media policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

3 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
FRANCIS George WRIGHT BEM Chair
None on record
Sarah Guest Trustee 01 November 2018
None on record
GLORIA Doris WRIGHT Trustee 01 January 2003
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £209.81k £261.47k £995.29k £530.09k £262.75k
Total expenditure £220.27k £226.00k £459.59k £284.88k £287.59k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A £12.00k N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies N/A N/A £995.29k £522.77k N/A
Income - Other trading activities N/A N/A £0 £0 N/A
Income - Charitable activities N/A N/A £0 £0 N/A
Income - Endowments N/A N/A £0 £0 N/A
Income - Investment N/A N/A £0 £7.32k N/A
Income - Other N/A N/A £0 £0 N/A
Income - Legacies N/A N/A £749.96k £236.86k N/A
Expenditure - Charitable activities N/A N/A £98.14k £120.52k N/A
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A N/A £239.31k £164.37k N/A
Expenditure - Governance N/A N/A £0 £0 N/A
Expenditure - Grants institution N/A N/A £0 £0 N/A
Expenditure - Investment management N/A N/A £2.00k £0 N/A
Expenditure - Other N/A N/A £122.15k £0 N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 18 December 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024

(These accounts
have been qualified)

18 December 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2023 04 October 2024 247 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 07 December 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2022 11 January 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 17 January 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2021 21 January 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 21 January 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2020 31 December 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 31 December 2020 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
SUSSEX LANTERN
SOUTH DOWN Way
LODGE LANE
KEYMER
WEST SUSSEX
BN6 8LX
Phone:
01273 841877