Financial history STEPPING OUT BREDON TODDLER GROUP

Charity number: 1091395
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/05/2020 31/05/2021 31/05/2022 31/05/2023 31/05/2024
Total gross income £552 £0 £645 £1.38k £843
Total expenditure £660 £107 £945 £886 £1.78k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A