Trustees DISABILITY CAMBRIDGESHIRE
Charity Number: 1091855

Charity reporting is overdue by 849 days
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Luke Michael Finbar Myhill | Chair | 10 January 2019 |
|
|
||||
Ruzina Begum | Trustee | 28 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
James Zaak Saunders | Trustee | 28 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
Julie Bussey | Trustee | 29 January 2021 |
|
|
||||
Mike Nellis | Trustee | 16 December 2019 |
|
|
||||
Hilary Bayles | Trustee | 10 January 2019 |
|
|
||||
Martin Smart Cllr | Trustee | 06 December 2018 |
|
|
||||
JOYCE ENID ANDRADE | Trustee | 15 January 2014 |
|
|
||||
ALISON WALKER | Trustee | 18 May 2012 |
|
|
||||
MARK TAYLOR | Trustee | 01 July 2000 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.