THE VICTORIA COLLEGE (JERSEY) UK FOUNDATION
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The advancement of education at Victoria College and Victoria College Preparatory School by the provision, maintenance and improvement of buildings, equipment and other facilities at the schools.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2014
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Amateur Sport
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Children/young People
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Jersey
Governance
- 14 May 2002: Standard registration
- 23 June 2016: Removed (Ceased to exist)
No other names
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2010 | 31/12/2011 | 31/12/2012 | 31/12/2013 | 31/12/2014 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £3.20k | £3.64k | £2.61k | £240 | £41 | |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2015 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2015 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2014 | 19 September 2015 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2014 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2013 | 05 October 2014 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2013 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2012 | 12 October 2013 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2012 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST EXECUTED ON THE 6TH MARCH 2002.
Charitable objects
THE TRUSTEES SHALL HOLD THE CAPITAL AND INCOME OF THE TRUST FUND UPON TRUST TO APPLY THE INCOME AND ALL OR SUCH PART OF THE CAPITAL AS THE TRUSTEES THINK FIT FOR ; A. THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE EDUCATION OF THE PUPILS OF THE EDUCATIONAL ESTABLISHMENTS KNOWN AS VICTORIA COLLEGE, JERSEY AND VICTORIA PREPARATORY SCHOOL, JERSEY ("THE SCHOOL") BY PROVIDING OR ASSISTING IN THE PROVISION, MAINTENANCE AND IMPROVEMENT OF BUILDINGS, RESOURCES, EQUIPMENT AND FACILITIES FOR THE BENEFIT OF PUPILS OF THE SCHOOLS, INCLUDING SPORTING AND RECREATIONAL FACILITIES; AND B. THE PROVISION OF GRANTS, BURSARIES AND SCHOLARSHIPS TO PRESENT AND FORMER PUPILS OF THE SCHOOLS TO ASSIST IN THE ADVANCEMENT OF THEIR EDUCATION OR FOR SUCH OTHER CHARITABLE PURPOSES AS THE TRUSTEES IN THEIR ABSOLUTE DISCRETION FROM TIME TO TIME THINK FIT. (PLEASE SEE A COPY OF THE DEED ON FILE).
Area of benefit
NATIONAL AND OVERSEAS
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window