Financial history WIGAN INDEPENDANT ADVICE CENTRE

Charity number: 1093383
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2011 31/03/2012 31/03/2013 31/03/2014 31/03/2015
Total gross income £92.72k £88.28k £96.43k £104.04k £104.23k
Total expenditure £103.67k £93.42k £94.96k £99.26k £91.89k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A £99.62k