GET SORTED ACADEMY OF MUSIC
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
TO PROVIDE EDUCATION, TRAINING AND EMPLOYMENT FOR YOUNG PEOPLE IN MUSICAL AND ARTS RELATED ACTIVITIES. THE CHARITY ALSO AIMS TO HELP YOUNG PEOPLE WHO ARE DISADVANTAGED FOR ANY NUMBER OF REASONS.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2017
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Rotherham
Governance
- 22 January 2003: Standard registration
- 14 November 2018: Removed (Transfer of funds)
- 14 November 2018: Funds transferred to 1074930 THE COALFIELDS REGENERATION TRUST
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2013 | 31/03/2014 | 31/03/2015 | 31/03/2016 | 31/03/2017 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £231.19k | £205.70k | £197.44k | £171.01k | £187.62k | |
|
Total expenditure | £259.32k | £249.91k | £208.51k | £185.30k | £167.98k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | £0 |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2018 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2018 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2017 | 02 October 2017 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2017 | 18 May 2017 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2016 | 09 January 2017 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2016 | 09 January 2017 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2015 | 27 October 2015 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2015 | 27 October 2015 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED ON 9 DECEMBER 2002 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION ON 23 FEBRUARY 2009.
Charitable objects
TO BENEFIT THE PEOPLE OF ROTHERHAM BOROUGH AND SURROUNDING AREA, PARTICULARLY YOUNG PEOPLE, ADULTS WITH SPECIAL EDUCATIONAL NEEDS AND THOSE FROM DISADVANTAGED COMMUNITIES BY PROMOTING VOCATIONAL TRAINING, EDUCATIONAL AND SOCIAL DEVELOPMENT THROUGH THE PROVISION OF MUSIC AND ARTS RELATED ACTIVITIES.
Area of benefit
ROTHERHAM BOROUGH.
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window