Trustees INTERNATIONAL FEDERATION OF PROFESSIONAL AROMATHERAPISTS ("IFPA")
Charity number: 1091325

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Denise Cusack | Trustee | 23 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Dr Raquel Costa | Trustee | 18 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Tomoyo Nozaki | Trustee | 18 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Yee Nga Wong | Trustee | 18 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Charlotte Norgaard | Trustee | 18 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Dr Nicole Bou Khalil | Trustee | 22 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Christine Courtney | Trustee | 27 November 2020 |
|
|
||||
Jane Court | Trustee | 27 November 2020 |
|
|
||||
LOUISE CARTA | Trustee | 16 March 2017 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.